+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (38)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 134)
- Passed House (Roll No. 133)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education then Finance
- Filed for introduction
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Chapter 106, Acts, 2012
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/12
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- To Governor 3/23/12
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/12 - House Journal #2756
On March 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/12 - Senate Journal #59
- To Governor 3/23/12 - Senate Journal #49
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- To Governor 3/23/12 - House Journal #2731
On March 10, 2012 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 418)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 419)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 24)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 24)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
- §18 - 20 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 8 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 14 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 12 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 6 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 9 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 10 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 7 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 13 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 11 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 15 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (8)
February 24, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 133)
February 24, 2014: Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 134)
March 10, 2012: Effective from passage (Roll No. 419)
March 9, 2012: Passed Senate (Roll No. 24)
March 9, 2012: Effective from passage (Roll No. 24)
February 22, 2012: Passed House (Roll No. 93)
February 22, 2012: Effective from passage (Roll No. 94)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor