+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 15, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter 117, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- To Governor 3/19/20
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 547)
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 743)
- Communicated to Senate
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
- Communicated to House
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House receded and passed (Roll No. 774)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal #579
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal #0
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal #586
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal #0
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- Returned to calendar by Rules Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Removed from calendar by Rules Committee
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Immediate consideration
- 2nd reference dispensed
- Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Judiciary
- Read 1st time
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Education
- To Education then Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 142)
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Motion to have bill committed to Judiciary on 3rd reading rejected
- Amendment reported by the Clerk
- Amendment adopted (Roll No. 143)
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 144)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment pending
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (14)
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- §18 - 33 - 1 - (New Code)
- §18 - 33 - 2 - (New Code)
- §18 - 33 - 3 - (New Code)
- §18 - 33 - 4 - (New Code)
- §18 - 33 - 5 - (New Code)
- §18 - 33 - 6 - (New Code)
- §18 - 33 - 7 - (New Code)
- §18 - 33 - 8 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (6)
March 7, 2020: House receded and passed (Roll No. 774)
March 7, 2020: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 547)
February 11, 2020: Amendment adopted (Roll No. 143)
February 11, 2020: Amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 142)
February 11, 2020: Passed House (Roll No. 144)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor