+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter 135, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/2016
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/24/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/2016 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal #17
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/16 - Senate Journal #20
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- House received Senate message
- Completed legislative action
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 605)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 416)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 20, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 120)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in House
- To Health and Human Resources
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- §33 - 16 I- 1 - (New Code)
- §33 - 16 I- 2 - (New Code)
- §33 - 16 I- 3 - (New Code)
- §33 - 16 I- 4 - (New Code)
- §33 - 15 - 4 m - (New Code)
- §33 - 16 - 3 y - (New Code)
- §33 - 24 - 7 n - (New Code)
- §33 - 25 - 8 k - (New Code)
- §33 - 25 A- 8 m - (New Code)
- §33 - 15 - 4 o - (New Code)
- §33 - 16 - 3aa - (New Code)
- §33 - 24 - 7 p - (New Code)
- §33 - 25 - 8 m - (New Code)
- §33 - 25 A- 8 o - (New Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2016: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 416)
February 20, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 120)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor