+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 37, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 2/20/18 - House Journal #601
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 2/20/18 - Senate Journal #6
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 2/20/18
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- To Governor 2/14/18 - House Journal #497
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- To Governor 2/14/18
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Governor 2/14/18 - Senate Journal #3
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote)
- House Message received
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 79)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 53)
- House reconsidered concurrence in Senate amendment
- House reconsidered passage (Voice)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 48)
- House received Senate message
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 66)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, House Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 4)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Statutes Amended (42)
- § 7 - 4 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- § 7 - 4 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- § 7 - 7 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- § 7 - 10 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §15 - 1 I- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §15 - 2 - 15 - (Amended Code)
- §15 - 2 C- 1 - (Amended Code)
- §15 - 9 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §15 - 11 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 2 F- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 3 C- 1 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 9 A- 3 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 30 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 47 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §17 C- 5 - 6 a - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 5 - 15 c - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 8 - 6 a - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 5 - 1 d - (Amended Code)
- §28 - 1 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §29 - 21 - 16 - (Amended Code)
- §31 - 20 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 4 - 20 - (Amended Code)
- §48 - 9 - 205 - (Amended Code)
- §48 - 9 - 301 a - (Amended Code)
- §48 - 22 - 301 - (Amended Code)
- §48 - 26 - 701 - (Amended Code)
- §48 - 26 -1002 - (Amended Code)
- §48 - 27 - 403 - (Amended Code)
- §49 - 1 - 201 - (Amended Code)
- §51 - 2 A- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §51 - 7 - 8 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 2 - 14 h - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 5 - 12 b - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 6 - 25 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 7 - 8 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 8 - 12 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 8 B- 11 a - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 8 C- 3 b - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 8 D- 9 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 11 - 23 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 12 - 10 - (Amended Code)
- §62 - 6 B- 5 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (6)
February 8, 2018: Passed Senate (Roll No. 78)
February 8, 2018: Passed Senate (Roll No. 79)
February 7, 2018: House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 53)
February 6, 2018: House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 48)
February 5, 2018: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 66)
January 19, 2018: Passed House (Roll No. 4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor