+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (42)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 133, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/14
- To Governor 3/28/14
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal #2840
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal #57
- To Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal #50
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal #2805
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 2)
- Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 2)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 298)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 297)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Judiciary
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- 2nd reference dispensed
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Interstate Cooperation
- To Interstate Cooperation then Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 175)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (102)
- §39 - 1 A- 1 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 11 - (New Code)
- §39 - 1 A- 7 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 3 - (New Code)
- §39 - 1 A- 3 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 4 - 203 - (Repealed Code)
- §57 - 4 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §29 C- 2 - 204 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 1 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §39 - 4 - 13 - (New Code)
- §39 - 4 - 30 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 1 - 105 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 14 - (New Code)
- §39 - 4 - 9 - (New Code)
- §39 - 4 - 2 - (New Code)
- §39 - 4 - 8 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 6 - 201 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 1 A- 8 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 2 - 208 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 1 A- 9 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 1 - 104 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 27 - (New Code)
- §29 - 4 - 13 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 - 4 - 7 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 - 4 - 15 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 - 4 - 8 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 4 - 201 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 10 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 4 - 103 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 24 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 4 - 402 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 7 - 101 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 6 - 202 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 4 - 202 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 36 - (New Code)
- §29 - 4 - 16 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 5 - 101 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 - 4 - 12 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 1 - 101 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 17 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 5 - 104 - (Repealed Code)
- §57 - 5 - 9 - (Amended Code)
- §39 - 4 - 29 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 4 - 102 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 5 - 103 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 2 - 202 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 38 - (New Code)
- §39 - 4 - 21 - (New Code)
- §39 - 4 - 16 - (New Code)
- §39 - 4 - 33 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 5 - 102 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 18 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 6 - 204 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 3 - 102 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 34 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 7 - 202 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 1 A- 4 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 3 - 101 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 4 - 104 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 8 - 101 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 7 - 201 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 4 - 401 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 2 - 201 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 4 - 101 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 4 - (New Code)
- §39 - 4 - 1 - (New Code)
- §29 - 4 - 6 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 15 - (New Code)
- §29 - 4 - 14 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 1 A- 5 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 6 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 1 - 106 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 1 - 102 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 2 - 207 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 4 - 301 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 2 - 206 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 5 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 2 - 301 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 37 - (New Code)
- §39 - 4 - 31 - (New Code)
- §29 - 4 - 5 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 20 - (New Code)
- §39 - 4 - 7 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 4 - 403 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 25 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 1 - 107 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 6 - 101 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 1 A- 2 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 12 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 2 - 203 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 - 4 - 4 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 1 A- 6 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 4 - 405 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 9 - 101 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 23 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 2 - 205 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 C- 1 - 103 - (Repealed Code)
- §59 - 1 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §39 - 4 - 26 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 6 - 203 - (Repealed Code)
- §39 - 4 - 35 - (New Code)
- §29 C- 6 - 103 - (Repealed Code)