+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 15, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter 273, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- To Governor 3/19/20
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 727)
- Communicated to Senate
- House received Senate message
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal #579
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal #0
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal #586
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal #0
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 488)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 2nd reading 3/4/20
- Committee Amendment Reported
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- On 1st reading
- Read 1st time
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 296)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in House
- To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (13)
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- §27 - 1 - 11 - (Amended Code)
- §27 - 5 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §27 - 5 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §27 - 5 - 2 a - (New Code)
- §27 - 5 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §27 - 5 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §27 - 5 - 10 - (Amended Code)
- §27 - 6 A- 12 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2020: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 488)
February 24, 2020: Passed House (Roll No. 296)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor