+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 173)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- §61 - 8 D- 3 - (Amended Code)
+ − Vote
February 26, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 173)
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor