+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House rejected (Roll No. 155)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment rejected (Roll No. 154)
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Recommitted to Judiciary on 1st reading
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Daily Calender
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Laid over on 1st reading, House Calendar, until 1/16/2014
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
- §14 - 4 - 5 - (New Code)
- §14 - 4 - 8 - (New Code)
- §14 - 4 - 6 - (New Code)
- §14 - 4 - 11 - (New Code)
- §14 - 4 - 1 - (New Code)
- §14 - 4 - 10 - (New Code)
- §14 - 4 - 3 - (New Code)
- §14 - 4 - 9 - (New Code)
- §14 - 4 - 4 - (New Code)
- §14 - 4 - 7 - (New Code)
- §14 - 4 - 2 - (New Code)
- § 9 - 7 - 6 - (Amended Code)
- §17 C- 15 - 49 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 1 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 21 - 9 - (Amended Code)
- §24 - 6 - 13 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2014: House rejected (Roll No. 155)
February 24, 2014: Amendment rejected (Roll No. 154)
January 25, 2012: Passed House (Roll No. 15)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor