+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 34, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/15/21
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- To Governor 4/14/21
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/15/21 - House Journal #0
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/15/21 - Senate Journal #505
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- To Governor 4/14/21 - House Journal #0
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/14/21 - Senate Journal #485
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 387)
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Communicated to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 387)
- Completed legislative action
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 372)
- Passed House (Roll No. 371)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Introduced in House
- To Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2021: Effective from passage (Roll No. 387)
April 8, 2021: Passed Senate (Roll No. 387)
March 31, 2021: Effective from passage (Roll No. 372)
March 31, 2021: Passed House (Roll No. 371)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor