+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 201)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Do pass
- Originating in House Finance
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §17 - 16 A- 4 - (Amended Code)
- §17 - 16 A- 18 - (Amended Code)
- §17 - 16 A- 10 - (Amended Code)
+ − Vote
April 3, 2013: Passed House (Roll No. 201)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor