+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 194)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- With title amendment, do pass
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Do pass, but first to Finance
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §14 - 2 A- 3 - (Amended Code)
- §14 - 2 A- 9 - (Amended Code)
- §14 - 2 A- 12 - (Amended Code)