+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 70, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/20/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal #28
- To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal #23
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal #0
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 551)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 426)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Education
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 263)
- Communicated to Senate
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 - 2 - 9 - (Amended Code)