+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Education
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 147)
- Read 3rd time
- Communicated to Senate
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 - 2 E- 8 - (New Code)
+ − Vote
March 23, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 147)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor