+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 239)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §48 - 9 - 206 - (Amended Code)
- §48 - 9 - 402 - (Amended Code)