+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 222, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/28/21
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- To Governor 4/22/21
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading with right to amend
- Health Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
- Judiciary Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 484)
- Senate requests House to concur
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 648)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- To Governor 4/22/21 - House Journal #0
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/22/21 - Senate Journal #491
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - House Journal #0
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - Senate Journal #535
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Judiciary
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 266)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment rejected (Voice vote)
- Amendment adopted (Roll No. 258)
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in House
- To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (12)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §16 - 2 I- 1 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 2 I- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 2 I- 3 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (4)
April 10, 2021: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 484)
March 24, 2021: Passed House (Roll No. 266)
March 23, 2021: Amendment adopted (Roll No. 258)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor