+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 41, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/26/19
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 3/25/19
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 501)
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 715)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal #291
- Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal #293
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal #0
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary
- Immediate consideration
- Read 1st time
- On 2nd reading to Judiciary
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Banking and Insurance
- To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 272)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- To House Banking and Insurance
- Introduced in House
- To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Statute Amended
- §31 A- 8 - 12 b - (Amended Code)