+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 230, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/11/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal #28
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal #14
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 388)
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Finance
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 233)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- With title amendment, do pass
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Introduced in House
- To Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §11 - 11 - 17 a - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
April 5, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 388)
March 28, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 233)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor