+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 156, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/19
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 3/20/19
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal #293
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal #284
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 401)
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 563)
- Completed legislative action
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Banking and Insurance
- To Banking and Insurance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 236)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- Introduced in House
- To Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §33 - 45 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §33 - 45 - 2 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2019: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 401)
February 21, 2019: Passed House (Roll No. 236)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor