+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 112, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/18/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal #28
- To Governor 4/18/17 - Senate Journal #19
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/18/17 - House Journal #0
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Communicated to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 418)
- Completed legislative action
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- To Government Organization
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 230)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
- Placed on Special Calender
- Read 1st time
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- From Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §17 - 2 A- 7 - (Amended Code)
- §17 - 2 A- 8 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
April 6, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 418)
March 28, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 230)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor