+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 214, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/18
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- To Governor 3/21/18
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 498)
- Communicated to House
- House Message received
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal #0
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal #460
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal #0
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal #463
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 434)
- House received Senate message
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 282)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, House Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 13)
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- § 6 - 1 - 3 a - (Amended Code)
- § 7 - 15 - 19 - (New Code)
- § 8 - 15 - 28 - (New Code)
- §16 - 4 C- 24 - (New Code)
- § 5 - 3 - 6 - (New Code)
- § 6 - 3 - 1 a - (Amended Code)