+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed to Rules on 3rd reading
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Committee Amendment Reported
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 126)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- § 7 - 15 - 19 - (New Code)
- § 8 - 15 - 28 - (New Code)
- §16 - 4 C- 24 - (New Code)
- § 6 - 1 - 3 a - (Amended Code)