+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter 83, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/16
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/23/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal #20
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #13
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading with right to amend
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 467)
- Title amendment adopted
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- Communicated to Senate
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate receded and passed (Roll No. 514)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass
- Having been read 1st time 3/8/16
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance
- On 2nd reading to Finance
- Immediate consideration
- Read 1st time
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Economic Development
- To Economic Development then Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 188)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/24
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 20, 2016 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development
- Introduced in House
- To Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §59 - 1 - 2 c - (New Code)