+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Finance Title amendment adopted
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 511)
- Education Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment
- Having been read 1st time 4/5/17
- Immediate consideration
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance on 2nd reading
- Motion
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass, with title amendment, but first to Finance
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- To Education
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 227)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 B- 1 - 1 d - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 511)
March 28, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 227)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor