+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- From House Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on Special Calendar
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in House
- To Health and Human Resources then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- § 5 - 16 - 3 - (Amended Code)