+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 49, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/15
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - House Journal #0
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - Senate Journal #93
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/16/15 - Senate Journal #7
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- To Governor 3/16/15
- To Governor 3/16/15 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 21)
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Communicated to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 21)
- Completed legislative action
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 28, 2015 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 258)
- Passed House (Roll No. 257)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Introduced in House
- To Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2015: Effective from passage (Roll No. 21)
March 9, 2015: Passed Senate (Roll No. 21)
February 28, 2015: Effective from passage (Roll No. 258)
February 28, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 257)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor