+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 232, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/19
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 3/19/19
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal #283
- Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal #293
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 503)
- House received Senate message
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 356)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 268)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Placed on Special Calender
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calender
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services
- Introduced in House
- To Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statute Amended
- §29 - 3 - 12 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2019: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 356)
February 22, 2019: Passed House (Roll No. 268)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor