+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 120)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- Introduced in House
- To Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- § 5 A- 2 - 35 - (New Code)
- § 5 A- 2 - 36 - (New Code)
+ − Vote
March 17, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 120)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor