+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (53)
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter 121, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/23/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal #20
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/1/2016 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #13
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 330)
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 330)
- House Message received
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- Communicated to Senate
- House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 393)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 394)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 228)
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 228)
- Read 3rd time
On February 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 3rd reading 2/28/16
- On 3rd reading
On February 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 104)
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 103)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (26)
- §11 - 12 - 86 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 - 3 - 23 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 - 3 - 24 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 - 3 - 25 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 - 3 - 26 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 1 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 2 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 3 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 4 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 5 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 6 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 7 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 8 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 9 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 10 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 11 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 12 - (New Code)
- §61 - 3 E- 1 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 3 E- 11 - (Amended Code)
- § 5 - 16 - 7 f - (New Code)
- § 5 - 16 B- 6 e - (New Code)
- §33 - 15 - 22 - (New Code)
- §33 - 16 - 18 - (New Code)
- §33 - 16 D- 17 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 13 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 14 - (New Code)