+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 177, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/18/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal #27
- To Governor 4/18/17 - Senate Journal #18
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/18/17 - House Journal #0
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 516)
- Completed legislative action
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- To Health and Human Resources
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 179)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- Do pass, but first to Health and Human Resources
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education then Health and Human Resources
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- §30 - 5 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 5 - 12 a - (New Code)
- § 7 - 5 - 24 - (Amended Code)
- §11 A- 2 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 5 - 11 a - (New Code)