+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 89, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/4/17 - House Journal #1331
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/4/17
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/4/17 - Senate Journal #96
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/29/17 - Senate Journal #2
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 3/29/17 - House Journal #961
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 3/29/17
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 208)
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Energy, Industry and Mining
- Introduced in Senate
- To Energy, Industry and Mining
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 118)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- To House Energy
- Introduced in House
- To Energy then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §22 - 30 - 3 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 208)
March 17, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 118)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor