+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 133)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (24)
- § 3 - 5 - 23 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 1 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 2 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 3 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 4 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 5 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 6 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 7 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 8 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 9 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 10 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 11 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 12 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 13 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 14 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 15 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 16 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 17 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 18 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 19 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 20 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 21 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 22 - (New Code)
- §16 - 8 A- 23 - (New Code)