+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 107, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/14/17
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/11/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/14/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/14/17 - Senate Journal #26
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal #14
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Completed legislative action
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 411)
- Communicated to House
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 132)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- § 5 A- 8 - 23 - (New Code)