+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 201, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/11/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal #26
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/6/17 - House Journal #1635
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/6/17
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/6/17 - Senate Journal #26
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 350)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 350)
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 371)
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate title amendment
- Passed House (Roll No. 370)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 110)
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Communicated to Senate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §15 - 1 J- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §15 - 1 J- 4 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (5)
April 4, 2017: Effective from passage (Roll No. 350)
April 4, 2017: Effective from passage (Roll No. 371)
April 4, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 370)
April 4, 2017: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 350)
March 16, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 110)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor