+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Military
- To Military then Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 176)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- Do pass, but first to Government Organization
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security
- Introduced in House
- To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- § 8 - 15 - 16 b - (New Code)
+ − Vote
March 25, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 176)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor