+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 132, Acts, 2013
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 5/1/13
- To Governor 5/1/13
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal #3161
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal #44
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- To Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal #3151
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal #40
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 36)
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd reference dispensed
- Reported do pass, but first to Government Organization
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- To Transportation and Infrastructure then Government Organization
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 35)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Do pass, but first to Judiciary
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- To House Roads and Transportation
- Introduced in House
- To Roads and Transportation then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §17 A- 6 - 7 - (Amended Code)