+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 155, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/19
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 3/25/19
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 505)
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 712)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal #290
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal #294
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment
- Immediate consideration
- Read 1st time
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 287)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Do pass, but first to Judiciary
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- To House Banking and Insurance
- Introduced in House
- To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- §33 - 52 - 1 - (New Code)
- §33 - 52 - 2 - (New Code)
- §33 - 52 - 3 - (New Code)
- §33 - 52 - 4 - (New Code)
- §33 - 15 - 4 t - (New Code)
- §33 - 16 - 3ee - (New Code)
- §33 - 24 - 7 t - (New Code)
- §33 - 25 - 8 q - (New Code)
- §33 - 25 A- 8 t - (New Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2019: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 505)
February 25, 2019: Passed House (Roll No. 287)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor