+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 121, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/20/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - Senate Journal #27
- To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal #23
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal #0
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 504)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 384)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
On April 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- On 1st reading
- Laid over on 1st reading 4/1/17
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 131)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- Introduced in House
- To Government Organization then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- §31 D- 5 - 504 - (Amended Code)
- §56 - 3 - 31 - (Amended Code)
- §56 - 3 - 33 - (Amended Code)
- §56 - 3 - 33 a - (Amended Code)
- §56 - 3 - 34 - (Amended Code)
- §31 B- 1 - 111 - (Amended Code)
- §31 E- 5 - 505 - (Amended Code)
- §47 - 9 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §31 E- 5 - 504 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
April 5, 2017: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 384)
March 21, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 131)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor