+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
- To Education
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 195)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- From Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar
- Read 1st time
- Placed on Special Calender
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- To House Finance
- Do pass, but first to Finance
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 B- 18 - 13 - (Amended Code)