+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 149, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/21
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- To Governor 4/16/21
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - House Journal #0
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - Senate Journal #522
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- To Governor 4/16/21 - House Journal #0
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/16/21 - Senate Journal #488
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- Communicated to Senate
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 440)
- Completed legislative action
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 308)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- On 1st reading
- Read 1st time
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 139)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- To House Technology and Infrastructure
- Introduced in House
- To Technology and Infrastructure then Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- § 5 A- 6 C- 1 - (New Code)
- § 5 A- 6 C- 2 - (New Code)
- § 5 A- 6 C- 3 - (New Code)
- § 5 A- 6 C- 4 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (3)
April 5, 2021: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 308)
March 12, 2021: Passed House (Roll No. 139)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor