+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Education
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 130)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 A- 2 - 7 - (Amended Code)
+ − Vote
March 21, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 130)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor