+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 91, Acts, 2013
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 5/3/13
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- To Governor 4/29/13
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - House Journal #3161
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - Senate Journal #45
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- To Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal #3149
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal #34
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 30)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 30)
- Senate requests House to concur
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 439)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 440)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
- Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 4/9/13
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass, with amendments, but first to Government Organization
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
- On 2nd reading to Government Organization
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Health and Human Resources
- To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 169)
- Passed House (Roll No. 168)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- To House Health and Human Resources
- Introduced in House
- To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- §16 - 5 O- 12 - (New Code)
- §16 - 5 O- 11 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 5 O- 3 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 5 O- 5 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 5 O- 8 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 5 O- 7 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 5 O- 6 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 5 O- 4 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 5 O- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 5 O- 10 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 5 O- 1 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (6)
April 13, 2013: Effective from passage (Roll No. 30)
April 13, 2013: Effective from passage (Roll No. 440)
April 13, 2013: Passed Senate (Roll No. 30)
April 3, 2013: Effective from passage (Roll No. 169)
April 3, 2013: Passed House (Roll No. 168)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor