+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 124, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/11/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal #26
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/6/17 - House Journal #1635
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/6/17
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/6/17 - Senate Journal #26
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Completed legislative action
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 347)
- Communicated to House
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Education
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 82)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §18 B- 17 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §18 B- 17 - 3 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
April 4, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 347)
March 10, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 82)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor