+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 223, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/24/17
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/20/17
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - Senate Journal #27
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal #22
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal #0
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 509)
- Senate requests House to concur
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 587)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Reported do pass, with amendments, but first to Judiciary
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Education
- To Education then Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 217)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment rejected (Voice vote)
On March 25, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §61 - 8 D- 5 - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 3 - 6 - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 3 - 10 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2017: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 509)
March 28, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 217)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor