+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (56)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 78, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/20/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - Senate Journal #27
- To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal #22
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal #0
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective July 1, 2017 (Roll No. 529)
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 528)
- House received Senate message
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Unanimous consent to amend
- Amended on 3rd reading (Voice vote)
- Effective July 1, 2017 (Roll No. 458)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 458)
- Education Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
- Floor Title amendment adopted
- Senate requests House to concur
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 3rd reading 4/6/17
- Deferred until foot of 3rd
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment
On March 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Education
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 161)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- Placed on Special Calender
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- From Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Postponed on 1st reading, Special Calendar, until 3/20/17
- Reported by the Clerk
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 - 8 - 4 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (5)
April 8, 2017: Effective July 1, 2017 (Roll No. 529)
April 7, 2017: Effective July 1, 2017 (Roll No. 458)
April 7, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 458)
March 24, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 161)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor