+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/22/18
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/22/18 - House Journal #0
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/22/18 - Senate Journal #462
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- To Governor 3/8/18 - House Journal #0
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- To Governor 3/8/18
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/8/18 - Senate Journal #185
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- Communicated to Senate
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 292)
- Completed legislative action
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 279)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- On 1st reading
- Read 1st time
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendment
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 44)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, House Calendar
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Introduced in House
- To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- §20 - 2 - 42 a - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 2 - 42 q - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 2 - 42 s - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 2 - 42 v - (Amended Code)