+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 502)
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
On March 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 81)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- § 3 - 5 - 13 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 5 - 13 a - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2017: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 502)
March 10, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 81)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor