+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 64, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/24/17
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/18/17
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - Senate Journal #27
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/18/17 - Senate Journal #18
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/18/17 - House Journal #0
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 501)
- Senate requests House to concur
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate title amendment
- House received Senate message
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Passed House (Roll No. 575)
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with title amendment
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 65)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, House Calendar
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §44 A- 3 - 17 - (New Code)
- §44 A- 3 - 18 - (New Code)
- §27 - 3 - 1 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 575)
April 8, 2017: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 501)
March 7, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 65)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor