+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Introduced in House
- To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- §20 - 2 - 5 i - (New Code)
- § 5 - 16 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §17 C- 5 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §17 C- 5 A- 2 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (6)
March 18, 2015: Senate concurred in House amendment, repassed bill (Roll No. 5)
March 14, 2015: House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 616)
March 14, 2015: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 20)
March 14, 2015: Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 56)
March 4, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 349)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor