+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed to Rules on 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Education
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, House Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 49)
- Read 3rd time
- Communicated to Senate
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment rejected (Voice vote)
- Amendment rejected (Roll No. 44)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, House Calendar
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, House Calendar
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- To House Education
- Introduced in House
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 - 28 - 3 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 49)
March 2, 2017: Amendment rejected (Roll No. 44)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor