+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Pensions
- To Pensions then Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- House Message received
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 107)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- By substitute, do pass
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- To House Pensions and Retirement
- Introduced in House
- To Pensions and Retirement then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- § 5 - 10 A- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §48 - 11 - 105 - (Amended Code)
- §48 - 11 - 106 - (Amended Code)
+ − Vote
March 16, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 107)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor